NC H286 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Fayetteville ETJ & Annexation of Shaw Heights
Title
Fayetteville ETJ & Annexation of Shaw Heights
Sponsors
Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. William Richardson [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Charles Graham [D] |
Rep. Yvonne Holley [D] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-26 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2019-04-26 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2019-04-26 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-03-07 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |