NC H274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Penalties for Debt Adjusting
Title
Increase Penalties for Debt Adjusting
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] |
Rep. Darren Jackson [D] | Rep. Philip Lehman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-10 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development |
2017-04-10 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary II Stricken |
2017-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Judiciary II |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |