NC H269 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Ch. SL 2013-364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Ch. SL 2013-364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children w/Disabilities Scholarship Grants
Title
Children w/Disabilities Scholarship Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-22 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 90 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - A4 Hamilton Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - A2 Brandon Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - A4 Hamilton Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - A2 Brandon Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | Ch. SL 2013-364 | |
2013-07-29 | Signed by Gov. 7/29/2013 | |
2013-07-24 | Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2013 | |
2013-07-23 | Ratified | |
2013-07-22 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-22 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-07-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2013 |
2013-07-21 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-07-19 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-15 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Amend Failed A4 |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendment Ruled Out of Order 3 |
2013-05-15 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-05-15 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013 |
2013-05-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-05-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-16 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2013-03-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |