NC H256 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Ch. SL 2016-25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Ch. SL 2016-25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Handicapped Parking/Veterans Plate
Title
Handicapped Parking/Veterans Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Ch. SL 2016-25 | |
2016-06-22 | Signed by Gov. 6/22/2016 | |
2016-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2016 | |
2016-06-20 | Ratified | |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2015-03-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed |