NC H248 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ombudsman Changes & DHHS Study
Title
Ombudsman Changes & DHHS Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Ch. SL 2017-103 | |
2017-07-12 | Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-06 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |