NC H245 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend W-S Charter/Certain Candidates
Title
Amend W-S Charter/Certain Candidates
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Evelyn Terry [D] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Edward Hanes [D] |
Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Ch. SL 2017-72 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/30/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-06 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government I |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S181 (Same As) 2017-10-05 - Ch. SL 2017-210