NC H236 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School Calendar Alignment/Carteret

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Calendar Alignment/Carteret

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-03-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2023-03-16SenateRegular Message Received From House
2023-03-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2023-03-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2023-03-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2023-03-14HousePlaced On Cal For 03/15/2023
2023-03-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2023-03-14HouseReptd Fav
2023-03-14HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-03-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-03-02HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-03-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2023-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115C84.2(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback