NC H235 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Evidence/Dist. Ct Speedy Trials
Title
Evidence/Dist. Ct Speedy Trials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-31 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S307 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Courts
Criminal Procedure
District Court
Electronic Government
Evidence
Information Technology
Internet
Public
Telecommunications
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Witnesses
Criminal Procedure
District Court
Electronic Government
Evidence
Information Technology
Internet
Public
Telecommunications
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 1225.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 139.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
8 | 58.20 | (n/a) | Citation Text |