NC H229 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Serial referral to Appropriations is added.
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Serial referral to Appropriations is added.
Summary
Retired Teachers Return to Work.
Title
Retired Teachers Return to Work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Serial referral to Appropriations is added. | |
2009-02-23 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Education | |
2009-02-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S362 (Same As) 2011-03-17 - Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H229 |