NC H217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Ch. SL 2019-200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Ch. SL 2019-200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
DIT Changes.-AB
Title
DIT Changes.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Saine [R] | Rep. Brenden Jones [R] | Rep. Kyle Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-07 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - A1 Saine Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - A1 Saine Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | Ch. SL 2019-200 | |
2019-08-21 | Signed by Gov. 8/21/2019 | |
2019-08-12 | Pres. To Gov. 8/12/2019 | |
2019-08-09 | Ratified | |
2019-08-07 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-08-07 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-08-07 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-08-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/07/2019 |
2019-08-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-08-06 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-07-08 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-07-08 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2019-07-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-04 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-02 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |