NC H198 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ch. SL 2024-15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

DOT Legislative Changes.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOT Legislative Changes.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-27 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - Veto Override (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 65 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - A1 Longest Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-27 Ch. SL 2024-15
2024-06-27SenateVeto Overridden
2024-06-26SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2024
2024-06-26SenateVeto Received From House
2024-06-26HouseVeto Overridden
2024-06-20HousePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2024
2024-06-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2024-05-24HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2024-05-23HouseReceived from the Governor
2024-05-23 Vetoed 05/23/2024
2024-05-22 Pres. To Gov. 5/22/2024
2024-05-22 Ratified
2024-05-22HouseOrdered Enrolled
2024-05-22HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2024-05-16HousePlaced On Cal For 05/22/2024
2024-05-16HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2024-05-15HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2024-05-15SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2024-05-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2024-05-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2024-05-15SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2024-05-15SenateReptd Fav
2024-05-14SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2024-05-14SenateReptd Fav
2024-05-08SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2024-05-08SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2024-05-08SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2024-05-07SenateSequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Stricken
2024-05-07SenateSequential Referral To Judiciary Stricken
2023-05-18SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-05-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2023-05-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-05-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2023-05-03SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2023-05-02HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2023-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2023-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2023-05-02HouseAmend Failed A1
2023-05-02HouseAdded to Calendar
2023-05-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2023-05-02HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2023-05-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-05-02HouseReptd Fav
2023-04-26HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2023-04-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-02-27HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-02-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2023-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2023/H198
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H198v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H198v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H198v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H198v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H198v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H198v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H198v6.pdf
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H198-SMBG-6(CSBGf-2)-v-14
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H198-SMBG-46(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H198-SMBG-49(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H198-SMBG-52(e3)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H198-SMBG-73(CSBG-25)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H198-SMSV-164(e4)-v-8
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H198-SMSV-166(e4)-v-3
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/310
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/311
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/524
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/625
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/732
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/632

Bill Comments

feedback