NC H196 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Ch. SL 2021-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Ch. SL 2021-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
2021 COVID-19 Response & Relief
Title
2021 COVID-19 Response & Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Ch. SL 2021-3 | |
2021-03-11 | Signed by Gov. 3/11/2021 | |
2021-03-04 | Pres. To Gov. 3/4/2021 | |
2021-03-04 | Ratified | |
2021-03-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-03-04 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-03-03 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-03-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Amend Failed A5 |
2021-03-03 | House | Amend Failed A4 |
2021-03-03 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2021-03-03 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2021-03-03 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-03-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/03/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-03-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S172 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Ch. SL 2021-25
Subjects
Administration Dept.
Agriculture
Agriculture Dept.
Appropriations
Authorities
Boards
Budget & Management Office
Budgeting
Capital & Infrastructure Fund
Capital Spending
Chaptered
Child Abuse
Coastal Resources
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Commissions
Computers
Continuing Care Facilities
Contracts
Corporations
Council Of State
Counties
Crimes
Cultural Resources
Cybersecurity
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Distance Education
Early Childhood Education
Economic Development
Education
Education Boards
Electronic Government
Elementary Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Environment
Escheats
Family Issues
Fees
Financial Services
Fish & Wildlife
Fisheries
Food & Nutrition Programs
Foods & Beverages
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Gaston County
Golden L.e.a.f
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Services
Higher Education
Housing
Inc.
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Inspections
Insurance
Internet
Kindergarten
Laboratories
Literacy
Loans
Local Government
Medicaid
Medical Care Comn.
Mental Health
Minors
Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.
Nonprofit
Notary Public
Nutrition
Occupations
Personnel
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Poverty
Presented
Private Schools
Professional Education
Property
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Real Estate
Rentals & Leasing
Reports
Rural Development
Salaries & Benefits
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Social Services
State Board Of
State Controller
Students
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Testing
Testing Services
Textiles
Tobacco
Tourism Development Authorities
Travel & Tourism
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Vaccines
Wildlife Resources Comn.
Witnesses
Agriculture
Agriculture Dept.
Appropriations
Authorities
Boards
Budget & Management Office
Budgeting
Capital & Infrastructure Fund
Capital Spending
Chaptered
Child Abuse
Coastal Resources
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Commissions
Computers
Continuing Care Facilities
Contracts
Corporations
Council Of State
Counties
Crimes
Cultural Resources
Cybersecurity
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Distance Education
Early Childhood Education
Economic Development
Education
Education Boards
Electronic Government
Elementary Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Environment
Escheats
Family Issues
Fees
Financial Services
Fish & Wildlife
Fisheries
Food & Nutrition Programs
Foods & Beverages
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Gaston County
Golden L.e.a.f
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Services
Higher Education
Housing
Inc.
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Inspections
Insurance
Internet
Kindergarten
Laboratories
Literacy
Loans
Local Government
Medicaid
Medical Care Comn.
Mental Health
Minors
Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.
Nonprofit
Notary Public
Nutrition
Occupations
Personnel
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Poverty
Presented
Private Schools
Professional Education
Property
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Real Estate
Rentals & Leasing
Reports
Rural Development
Salaries & Benefits
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Social Services
State Board Of
State Controller
Students
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Testing
Testing Services
Textiles
Tobacco
Tourism Development Authorities
Travel & Tourism
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Vaccines
Wildlife Resources Comn.
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
108D | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
10B | 200 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | 25 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
11 | 11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
136 | 18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 1373 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143C | 6-11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 406 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 800 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53A | 407 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
60A | 801 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
84 | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 106.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 113.52 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 21.132 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 85.15B | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 85.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 91 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 93 | (n/a) | Citation Text |