NC S172 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Ch. SL 2021-25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Additional COVID-19 Response & Relief

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Additional COVID-19 Response & Relief

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Ch. SL 2021-25
2021-05-24 Signed by Gov. 5/24/2021
2021-05-20 Pres. To Gov. 5/20/2021
2021-05-20 Ratified
2021-05-20SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-05-20SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-05-20SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-05-20HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-20HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-20HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-05-20HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-06HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-05HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-05SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-05-04SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-04SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-05-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-29SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-29SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-04-29SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-03SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H196 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Ch. SL 2021-3

Subjects

Administration Dept.
Agriculture
Agriculture Dept.
Appropriations
Authorities
Boards
Budget & Management Office
Budgeting
Capital & Infrastructure Fund
Capital Spending
Chaptered
Child Abuse
Coastal Resources
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Commissions
Computers
Corporations
Council Of State
Counties
Crimes
Cultural Resources
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Distance Education
Early Childhood Education
Economic Development
Education
Education Boards
Electronic Government
Elementary Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Environment
Escheats
Family Issues
Fees
Financial Services
Fish & Wildlife
Fisheries
Food & Nutrition Programs
Foods & Beverages
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Gaston County
Golden L.e.a.f
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Services
Higher Education
Housing
Inc.
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Insurance
Internet
Kindergarten
Laboratories
Literacy
Loans
Local Government
Medicaid
Mental Health
Minors
Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.
Nonprofit
Notary Public
Nutrition
Occupations
Personnel
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Poverty
Presented
Private Schools
Professional Education
Property
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Real Estate
Rentals & Leasing
Reports
Rural Development
Salaries & Benefits
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Social Services
State Board Of
State Controller
Students
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Testing
Testing Services
Textiles
Tobacco
Tourism Development Authorities
Travel & Tourism
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Vaccines
Wildlife Resources Comn.
Witnesses

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
143C5-4(n/a)Citation Text
CV-2.2(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S172
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S172v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S172v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S172v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S172v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S172v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S172v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50917/0/S172-PCS35274-MLa-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51906/0/S172-PCS35287-LRa-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S172-SMML-2(CSMLa-2)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S172-SMLR-5(CSLRa-1)-v-6
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/140
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/235
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/364

Bill Comments 750

feedback