NC H1812 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DV Cases/Review Criminal Record
Title
DV Cases/Review Criminal Record
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-135 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1243 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I