NC H180 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Ch. SL 2013-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Ch. SL 2013-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mechanics Liens/Technical Corrections
Title
Mechanics Liens/Technical Corrections
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] |
Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Ch. SL 2013-16 | |
2013-03-28 | Signed by Gov. 3/28/2013 | |
2013-03-21 | Pres. To Gov. 3/21/2013 | |
2013-03-21 | Ratified | |
2013-03-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-03-20 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/20/2013 |
2013-03-18 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-03-14 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/06/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-02-28 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |