NC H1699 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Education Cabinet Est. STEM Priority
Title
Education Cabinet Est. STEM Priority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Education | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Science and Technology, if favorable, Education | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1198 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-41