NC H155 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus Education Law Changes
Title
Omnibus Education Law Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Larry Bell [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Deb Butler [D] | Rep. George Graham [D] | Rep. Edward Hanes [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Evelyn Terry [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-157 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-27 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/22/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | Ref To Com On Education - K-12 |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |