NC H1409 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-532
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-532
Summary
Building Code Exclusion/Certain Wiring.
Title
Building Code Exclusion/Certain Wiring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-532 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-08 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-06 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-06 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-06-30 | Ref To Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-06-30 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-25 | Engrossed | |
2009-06-25 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-25 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-06-24 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-06-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1409 |