NC H1407 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. Res 2010-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. Res 2010-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor NCCU's 100th Anniversary
Title
Honor NCCU's 100th Anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. Res 2010-28 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-13 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |