NC H135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Enjoin Sanctuary Ordinances
Title
Enjoin Sanctuary Ordinances
Sponsors
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Michele Presnell [R] | Rep. Michael Speciale [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] |
Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. David Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2019 |
2019-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-05-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-03 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Stricken |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Universities |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Education - Universities, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S341 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate