NC H1091 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Ch. SL 2018-106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Ch. SL 2018-106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Norwood Charter Revised & Consolidated
Title
Norwood Charter Revised & Consolidated
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Burr [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Ch. SL 2018-106 | |
2018-06-26 | Ratified | |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-11 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government I |
2018-06-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Filed |