NC H1086 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Counties/Internet Infrastructure
Title
Counties/Internet Infrastructure
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Dobson [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] | Rep. Michele Presnell [R] | Rep. David Rogers [R] |
Sen. Gale Adcock [D] | Rep. Cody Henson [R] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] |
Rep. John Szoka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-06-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-12 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Finance |
2018-06-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-12 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2018-06-07 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, Information Technology, if favorable, Finance |
2018-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-07 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-06 | House | Filed |