NC H1063 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Ch. SL 2020-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Ch. SL 2020-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Fund VIPER Tower Hardware Upgrades
Title
Fund VIPER Tower Hardware Upgrades
Sponsors
Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. James Boles [R] | Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Sen. Steve Jarvis [R] |
Rep. David Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Ch. SL 2020-14 | |
2020-06-12 | Signed by Gov. 6/12/2020 | |
2020-06-09 | Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2020 | |
2020-06-08 | Ratified | |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2020-05-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-05-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-05-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-05-28 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2020-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-06 | House | Filed |