NC H1048 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
CPS Intake Screening/PED Recommendations
Title
CPS Intake Screening/PED Recommendations
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. Allen McNeill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2020-06-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/10/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-04-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-04-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S708 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House