NC H1039 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - Conf Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - Conf Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus Occupancy Tax Changes
Title
Omnibus Occupancy Tax Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-30 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-28 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2016-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016 |
2016-06-27 | House | Ruled Material |
2016-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-27 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-09 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/08/2016 |
2016-06-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-05 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2016-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-04 | House | Filed |