NC H1000 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Ref To Com On Finance
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Ref To Com On Finance
Summary
Alleghany/Surry Delinquent Tax - No Permit.
Title
Alleghany/Surry Delinquent Tax - No Permit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-04 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed On Cal For 4/30/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-02 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1000 |