MD HB363 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the 1-day beer and wine tasting (BWT) license in Caroline County to be a 1-day beer, wine, and liquor tasting (BWLT) license; altering certain qualifications for the license; and altering the amounts of alcoholic beverages an individual may consume at a tasting.
Title
Caroline County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB529 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Caroline County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Caroline County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 15 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 15 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |