NY S00365 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Internet and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the New York privacy act to require companies to disclose their methods of de-identifying personal information, to place special safeguards around data sharing and to allow consumers to obtain the names of all entities with whom their information is shared.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the New York privacy act to require companies to disclose their methods of de-identifying personal information, to place special safeguards around data sharing and to allow consumers to obtain the names of all entities with whom their information is shared.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-08Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2023-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1671
2023-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-06-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 365B
2023-06-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2023-05-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-05-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 365A
2023-05-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
2023-04-25SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A07423 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback