MT SR70 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution on Colstrip's 100th anniversary
Title
Resolution on Colstrip's 100th anniversary
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Small [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-04-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-04-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-04-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-04-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-04-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-04-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-04-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-04-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-04-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-04-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-04-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-04-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-04-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-04-06 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-04-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-04-06 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2022-12-06 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-09-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |