MT SR46 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Governor's appointment to the 1st Judicial District
Title
Confirm Governor's appointment to the 1st Judicial District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-30 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Judiciary |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Not Adopted (S) Judiciary |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Not Adopted (S) Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-01 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-29 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-26 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |