MT SR29 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirmation of appointees to the MHS Board of Trustees
Title
Confirmation of appointees to the MHS Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-03 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Resolution Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders |
2013-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-27 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-03-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-03-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-03-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-03-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-03-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-03-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-03-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-03-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-03-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-03-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |