MT SR16 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Governor's appointee to Board of Outfitters
Title
Confirm Governor's appointee to Board of Outfitters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Passed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) Adverse Committee Report Adopted (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) Adverse Committee Report Adopted (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Adverse Committee Report Adopted (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-23 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-20 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |