MT SJ27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study of water rights on Taylor Grazing Act lands
Title
Study of water rights on Taylor Grazing Act lands
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lang [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-04-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-04-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-04-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-04-09 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-04-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-04-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-04-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-04-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-04-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-04-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-04-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-03-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-12-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |