MT SJ19 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study on sex offender and violent offender registries
Title
Interim study on sex offender and violent offender registries
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Sands [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-23 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-03-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-03-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-03-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-03-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-03-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-03-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-03-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-03-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-03-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-03-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-12-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |