MT SJ16 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution urging federal country of origin labeling legislation
Title
Resolution urging federal country of origin labeling legislation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-10 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Agriculture |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-02-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-26 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-02-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-02-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |