MT SB338 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to closure of certain coal-fired generation
Title
Revise laws related to closure of certain coal-fired generation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-07 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-03-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-03-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-03-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-06 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-03-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-02-28 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-18 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2017-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-09-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |