MT SB28 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise taxation of certain incremental oil production
Title
Revise taxation of certain incremental oil production
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2019-01-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2019-01-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2018-12-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-07 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-11-30 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-11-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-07-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |