MT SB250 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt Safety of the Child First Act
Title
Adopt Safety of the Child First Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - (H) Motion Carried (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - (H) Motion Carried (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Motion Carried |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-19 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-11 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-31 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-10 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-03-09 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2023-03-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-01 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-03 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-12-30 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-12-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-12-30 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-12-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-10-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |