MT SB210 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Include mountain lion in livestock loss program
Title
Include mountain lion in livestock loss program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture |
2015-03-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-26 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2014-12-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2014-12-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-11-25 | (C) Draft Request Received |