MT SB198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for the EPSDT benefit
Title
Establishing requirements for the EPSDT benefit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Human Services |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Human Services |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2017-02-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-01 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-07 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |