MT SB165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws related to the department of environmental quality
Title
Generally revise laws related to the department of environmental quality
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Glimm [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-05-03 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-07 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-27 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Local Government |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Local Government |
2021-02-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-15 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-14 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-10-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |