MT HJ54 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation
Pending: Senate Highways and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation
Pending: Senate Highways and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study on highway safety
Title
Interim study on highway safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2021-04-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-04-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-04-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-04-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-04-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-04-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-04-21 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2021-01-26 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Draft Request Received |