MT HB565 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify requirements for providing services to high-risk children
Title
Clarify requirements for providing services to high-risk children
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Noonan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-02 | (H) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-27 | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-20 | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-19 | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Returned to House | |
2011-04-11 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-03-30 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-03-24 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-23 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-09 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-09 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-03-09 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-23 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended | |
2011-02-23 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Human Services | |
2011-02-21 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-21 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Human Services | |
2011-02-19 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services | |
2011-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services | |
2011-02-15 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-02-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-02-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-02-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-02-02 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |