MT HB496 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Referendum to exempt religious communications from campaign finance reports
Title
Referendum to exempt religious communications from campaign finance reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2013-02-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-01-10 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |