MT HB357 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require state agencies to coordinate with county local governments
Title
Require state agencies to coordinate with county local governments
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Local Government |
2015-02-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2015-02-09 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-07 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-07 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-31 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-30 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2014-12-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=357&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/hb0399/HB0357_1.pdf |