MT HB304 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Name portion of US Highway 2 after Highway Patrol officer David Graham
Title
Name portion of US Highway 2 after Highway Patrol officer David Graham
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Sonju [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Signed by Governor   | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-03-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-03-20 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate   | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-19 | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Returned to House with Amendments   | |
2009-03-17 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-16 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-03-16 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2009-02-23 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2009-02-23 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-02-11 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-10 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-07 | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration   | |
2009-02-07 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Transportation | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Transportation | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation | |
2009-01-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-20 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-01-20 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation | |
2009-01-20 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-01-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-01-14 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=304&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |