MT HB287 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise absentee ballot list confirmation laws
Title
Revise absentee ballot list confirmation laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-03 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-10 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) State Administration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-10 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2017-02-02 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2017-01-20 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2017-01-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2017-01-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-09-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |