MT HB245 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to raw milk
Title
Revise laws related to raw milk
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postpone Motion Failed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postpone Motion Failed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concur as Amended Motion Failed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-17 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-16 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-06 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed (H) Human Services |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed (H) Human Services |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received (H) Human Services |
2015-01-27 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested (H) Human Services |
2015-01-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received (H) Human Services |
2015-01-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2014-12-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-02 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-11-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |