MT HB244 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise definition of elder abuse
Title
Revise definition of elder abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-03-20 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-02-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-02-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-20 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2017-02-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2017-01-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Human Services |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2017-01-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-07-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |