MT HB222 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize secretary of state to remove ineligible candidates from ballot
Title
Authorize secretary of state to remove ineligible candidates from ballot
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2013-02-28 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-02-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-08 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2013-02-07 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2013-01-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2013-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2013-01-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-01-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-25 | (C) Draft Request Received |